This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:09:05 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JOHNSON, JAHQUALINE MARQUIS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JOHNSON, JAHQUALINE MARQUIS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOLES, W JOEL, DANNHEISSER., THOMAS and NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOLES, W JOEL

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JOHNSON, JAHQUALINE MARQUIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION F

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/23/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: TRANSFERRED/CONSOLIDATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/9/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BOLES, W JOEL; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/23/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 562506518-7 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 562506517-4 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 511456453-3 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 562506519-0 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 562506520-2 POSTED $250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 5 - (810.02(4B)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 4 - (810.02(4B)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (88888888888) COUNTY ORDINANCE VIOLATION - CRIMINAL PENALTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (810.02(4B)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (810.02(4B)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED CONVEYANCE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less