This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/04/2020 at 17:06:13 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. JACKSON, ERIC RONTELLE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against JACKSON, ERIC RONTELLE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************88 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

JACKSON, ERIC RONTELLE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 07/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 07/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS (893.13(6b)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: ADJ W/H BY JDG [W]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCOURT WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA19606429 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 01/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketRECIDIVIST: CASE ASSIGNED TO DIV III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/07/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000088 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6B)) MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less