This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:12:02 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. HAWTHORNE, JASON WADE

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against HAWTHORNE, JASON WADE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NOBLES, LINDA L., BERGOSH, GARY L and KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NOBLES, LINDA L.

BERGOSH, GARY L

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HAWTHORNE, JASON WADE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

10/1/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

9/29/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/30/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/16/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/30/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPTR AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/16/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 004122 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketN/A SEQ: 2 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less