This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 19:06:38 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GRANDISON, KEYON TIESHAWN

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRANDISON, KEYON TIESHAWN. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, NOBLES, LINDA L. and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************31 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

NOBLES, LINDA L.

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GRANDISON, KEYON TIESHAWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/12/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 05/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (784.041(2A)) COMMIT DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND PSE5 136069 POSTED $3,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/12/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/20/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000831 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.041(2A)) COMMIT DOMESTIC BATTERY BY STRANGULATION

    Read MoreRead Less