Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/13/2021 at 17:13:54 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GRACE, ROGER BUTCH JR

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GRACE, ROGER BUTCH JR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, ROBINSON, COLEMAN L and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************00 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GRACE, ROGER BUTCH JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • HearingDate time: 7/14/2021 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5625478701 POSTED $1,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5625478714 POSTED $1,250.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingDate time: 5/7/2021 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION WITH CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 07/14/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 3; Description: POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION (893.13(6a)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION WITH CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 05/07/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 04/16/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 001700 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF COCAINE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant