This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 05:27:12 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GARRETT, TIMOTHY SHAINE

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GARRETT, TIMOTHY SHAINE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are YOUNG, CHARLES P, BOLES, W JOEL, BERGOSH, GARY L and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************41 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

YOUNG, CHARLES P

BOLES, W JOEL

BERGOSH, GARY L

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GARRETT, TIMOTHY SHAINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

REVOCATION OF PROBATION ORDER

9/19/2019: REVOCATION OF PROBATION ORDER

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

9/13/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8167.1060 / 2019082624)

9/19/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8167.1060 / 2019082624)

PROPOSED CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

8/12/2019: PROPOSED CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED - PNC TO VOP

8/12/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED - PNC TO VOP

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY VIOLATION OF PROBATION/COMMUNITY CONTROL

7/23/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY VIOLATION OF PROBATION/COMMUNITY CONTROL

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

7/17/2019: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

7/17/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

ARREST REPORT

7/17/2019: ARREST REPORT

PROBATION ORDER

4/2/2019: PROBATION ORDER

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8070.1207 / 2019027919)

3/29/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8070.1207 / 2019027919)

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

3/26/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

3/18/2019: PROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

3/13/2019: SENTENCE RECOMMENDATION

CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

3/13/2019: CRIMINAL PUNISHMENT CODES/GUIDELINES SCORESHEET

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

1/28/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

1/3/2019: INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

ARREST REPORT

1/3/2019: ARREST REPORT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketFINANCIAL OBLIGATION SUSPENSION ISSUED 07/06/2020 - FAILED TO PAY $868.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: SUSPEND DRIVERS LICENSE (FOS) REQUIRED BY: 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: NOTICE OF DL SUSPEND FOR NONPAYMENT OF FINES & COS REQUIRED BY: 07/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 05/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8167.1060 / 2019082624)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREVOCATION OF PROBATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT - Recorded (OR.8164.61 / 2019080725)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
65 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 01/24/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BOLES, W JOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/03/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/03/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000041 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (806.13(1B1)) CRIM MISCH-200 DOLLARS AND UNDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (810.02(4A)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (812.014(2C1)) GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant