This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 17:03:33 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. GALLAHER, OCTAVIA RENA

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against GALLAHER, OCTAVIA RENA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************74 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

GALLAHER, OCTAVIA RENA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/09/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/9/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCRIMINAL SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/30/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/09/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 01/30/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/27/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000374 A

    Read MoreRead Less