This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 17:03:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FOLSOM, QUAJUAN MALACHI

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FOLSOM, QUAJUAN MALACHI. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L and SHACKELFORD, JAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************23 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

SHACKELFORD, JAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FOLSOM, QUAJUAN MALACHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2020
  • HearingDate time: 5/27/2020 8:30 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: SHACKELFORD, JAN; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO WITHDRAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/21/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 05/27/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO DIVISION DUE TO 2019 CF 003835 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND X60409565 POSTED $5,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/21/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000523 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2C6)) GRAND THEFT AUTO

    Read MoreRead Less