This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 17:03:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. FINKLEA, DEANTE MARQUISE

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against FINKLEA, DEANTE MARQUISE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************78 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

FINKLEA, DEANTE MARQUISE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2020
  • HearingDate time: 4/14/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/2/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 04/14/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN / , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (790.01(1)) CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/02/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR (CO DEF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR SEQ: 1 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR SEQ: 2 - (790.01(1)) CARRYING CONCEALED WEAPON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/13/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000678 A

    Read MoreRead Less