Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/13/2021 at 17:10:23 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. EDWIN, MICHELLE MARIE

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against EDWIN, MICHELLE MARIE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24 A

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

EDWIN, MICHELLE MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 5/11/2021; Receipt Number: 2021035497; Applied Amount: $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $500.00 RECEIPT #2021035497 FROM CASH BOND #89182

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • DocketCASH BOND 89182 (784.03(1A1)) RELEASED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE (784.03(1a1)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION/INTERVENTION [H]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPTD ACCEPTANCE FORM & WAIVER OF LIMITATION FOR SPEEDY TRIAL FILED 01/07/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • HearingDate time: 5/6/2021 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 05/06/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • HearingDate time: 4/16/2021 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASH BOND 89182 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 04/16/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSMITH, KERRA A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION TWO ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 04/16/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 MM 001624 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant