This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/15/2021 at 17:04:32 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DIXON, JONATHAN NATHANIEL

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DIXON, JONATHAN NATHANIEL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************97 A

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DIXON, JONATHAN NATHANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

NICHOLLS, WESLEY GEORGE II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • HearingDate time: 8/31/2021 10:45 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO ATTORNEY OF APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW & APPOINT REGIONAL CONFLICT COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 08/31/2021 AT 10:45 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 07/19/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/19/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 MM 003097 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A1)) BATTERY-TOUCH OR STRIKE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant