This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/23/2020 at 17:08:11 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DEBLOIS, BRETT DANIEL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DEBLOIS, BRETT DANIEL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DEBLOIS, BRETT DANIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

10/15/2020: INFORMATION

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

10/15/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/15/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: FAILED TO APPEAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (843.02) RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 2 - (901.36(1)) GIVING FALSE NAME OR ID TO LEO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 3 - (856.021) LOITERING-OR PROWLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004122 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (843.02) RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (856.021) LOITERING-OR PROWLING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (901.36(1)) GIVING FALSE NAME OR ID TO LEO

    Read MoreRead Less