This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 19:04:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DAVIS, DOMINIC SCHCUR

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAVIS, DOMINIC SCHCUR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BRODERSEN, AMY P and SMITH, KERRA A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BRODERSEN, AMY P

SMITH, KERRA A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAVIS, DOMINIC SCHCUR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

2/20/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

2/20/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/07/2020
  • HearingDate time: 4/7/2020 8:30 AM; Event: PLEA DAY; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketFIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDISCOVERY EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA20620154 POSTED $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/20/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 04/07/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/20/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000753 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less