Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/04/2021 at 14:10:53 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DALE, CHARLES JAMARIUS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DALE, CHARLES JAMARIUS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L, NOBLES, LINDA L., FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J and BOLES, W JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************92 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

NOBLES, LINDA L.

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

BOLES, W JOEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DALE, CHARLES JAMARIUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

AMOND, ELIZABETH ANN

CASHWELL, PATRECE

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO TRANSCRIBE

7/27/2020: MOTION TO TRANSCRIBE

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

7/10/2020: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

5/14/2020: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM - NO COST OF TRANSPORTATION

4/29/2020: STATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM - NO COST OF TRANSPORTATION

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

3/23/2020: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

ARREST REPORT

2/24/2020: ARREST REPORT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

2/21/2020: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/19/2020: WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

2/18/2020: BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND 2020CF492A POSTED $0.00

2/18/2020: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND 2020CF492A POSTED $0.00

BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

2/18/2020: BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

2/6/2020: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

PROFESSIONAL BOND AB19134115 POSTED $15,000.00

2/3/2020: PROFESSIONAL BOND AB19134115 POSTED $15,000.00

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

1/31/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

1/31/2020: PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

ARREST REPORT

1/31/2020: ARREST REPORT

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingDate time: 2/16/2021 9:45 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 02/16/2021 AT 9:45 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L. - DEFENDANT IS IN CUSTODY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • HearingDate time: 12/30/2020 1:30 PM; Event: MINI DOCKET DAY; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 02/17/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 12/15/2020 9:45 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMOTION TO EXCUSE THE DEFENDANT AND DEFENSE ATTORNEY AND ANNOUNCE READY FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketMINI DOCKET DAY SET FOR 12/30/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 12/15/2020 AT 9:45 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
133 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/31/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000492 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketN/A SEQ: 9 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 8 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 7 - (893.13(6B)) MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 7 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 6 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 4 - (893.13(6A)) POSSESSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE WO PRESCRIPTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (893.13(1A2)) DRUGS SELL-OTHER SCHEDULE III OR IV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.13(1A1)) COCAINE-POSSESS WITH INTENT TO SELL MFG DELIV ETC SCHEDULE II

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(1A1)) DRUGS-POSSESS METH W/ INTENT TO SELL MANUFACTURE DELIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant