This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/15/2021 at 17:20:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. DAILEY, SHAWN DONTAY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against DAILEY, SHAWN DONTAY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L, KINSEY, JENNIE and DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************47 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

KINSEY, JENNIE

DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

DAILEY, SHAWN DONTAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • HearingDate time: 1/5/2022 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingDate time: 10/8/2021 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: BOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 01/05/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION WITH CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: STOLEN PROP DEAL IN (812.019(1)); Level: F; Degree: S; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketNOFILE/NO PROSECUTION SEQ: 2 - (812.019(1)) STOLEN PROP DEAL IN

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/08/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN CR 404/ , JDG: DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketROBINSON, COLEMAN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 004047 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.019(1)) STOLEN PROP DEAL IN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.014(2)(E)) PETIT THEFT 1ST DEGREE PROP 100 TO UND 750 DOLS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant