This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/02/2020 at 17:01:58 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CONTRERAS, LUIS GABRIEL

Case Summary

On 02/03/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CONTRERAS, LUIS GABRIEL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBINSON, COLEMAN L and BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************22 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CONTRERAS, LUIS GABRIEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N

Defendant Attorney

DEES, ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2020
  • HearingDate time: 4/29/2020 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/21/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY AND WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 04/29/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000 (812.014(2c1)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION WITH CHARGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketWAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, PLEA OF NOT GUILTY & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA19612412 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND AA19612414 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/21/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/03/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000522 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2C1)) GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.155(3)) FAIL REDELIV HIRED LEASED PROP 300 DOLS OR OVR

    Read MoreRead Less