This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 09/16/2021 at 17:14:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. COBB, EDDIE LEE

Case Summary

On 08/19/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against COBB, EDDIE LEE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BERGOSH, GARY L, ROBINSON, COLEMAN L and YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************24 A

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BERGOSH, GARY L

ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

COBB, EDDIE LEE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N

Defendant Attorneys

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

CRIMINAL, CONFLICT COUNSEL

NICHOLLS, WESLEY GEORGE II

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingDate time: 11/17/2021 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • HearingDate time: 9/9/2021 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 11/17/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND OSE310002718 POSTED $1,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL, AND NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3C)) PETIT THEFT THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 09/09/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: ROBINSON, COLEMAN L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION N ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 08/19/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN CR 404/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketBERGOSH, GARY L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 08/19/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 003624 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3C)) PETIT THEFT THIRD OR SUBSEQUENT CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant