This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 16:11:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CAMPBELL, DEXTER JERMOR

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CAMPBELL, DEXTER JERMOR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN and BERGOSH, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************20 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

BERGOSH, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CAMPBELL, DEXTER JERMOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/16/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BERGOSH, GARY L; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5625399547 POSTED $2,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5625399550 POSTED $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 5625399563 POSTED $2,500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/16/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BERGOSH, GARY L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION E ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 004120 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(2)) BATTERY- PRIOR CONVICTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (843.02) RESISTING ARREST WITHOUT VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (914.22(1)) HINDER, DELAY, OR PREVENT THE COMMUNCATION TO A LAW ENFORCEMENT OFFICER

    Read MoreRead Less