This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 12:35:46 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CALVIN, AMY MARIE

Case Summary

On 01/16/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CALVIN, AMY MARIE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAMS, JOYCE H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************89 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAMS, JOYCE H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CALVIN, AMY MARIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS

6/11/2019: ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS

BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

5/29/2019: BOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

5/24/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

5/14/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

FOURTH AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

4/24/2019: FOURTH AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

4/9/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

ORDER APPOINTING FIRST EXPERT FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION

4/3/2019: ORDER APPOINTING FIRST EXPERT FOR COMPETENCY EVALUATION

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

3/6/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

SECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

2/27/2019: SECOND AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

2/18/2019: FIRST AMENDED DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

INFORMATION

2/14/2019: INFORMATION

INFORMATION

2/13/2019: INFORMATION

DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

2/11/2019: DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

2/11/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

PTR AGREEMENT

1/18/2019: PTR AGREEMENT

PRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND 2019MM000389A POSTED $0.00

1/17/2019: PRE-TRIAL RELEASE BOND 2019MM000389A POSTED $0.00

INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

1/16/2019: INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

ARREST REPORT

1/16/2019: ARREST REPORT

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF EXPERT WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • HearingDate time: 5/24/2019 8:30 AM; Event: FINAL PLEAS; Judge: WILLIAMS, JOYCE H; Location: COURTROOM 305; Result: NOLLE PROS/NO PROS/DISMISSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE (893.147(1)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE (812.014(3a)); Level: M; Degree: S; Disposition: NOLLE PROSEQUI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3A)) PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • DocketNOLLE PROSEQUI SEQ: 2 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketPSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION FILED BY DR. STEPHEN ZIEMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPLEA DAY SET FOR 03/06/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN MC/ , JDG: WILLIAMS, JOYCE H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/16/2019 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: WILLIAMS, JOYCE H

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketWILLIAMS, JOYCE H: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/16/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 MM 000389 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3A)) PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant