This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/15/2021 at 17:20:18 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BUSBEE, RODNEY GENE

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BUSBEE, RODNEY GENE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOLES, W JOEL, KINSEY, JENNIE and DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************48 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOLES, W JOEL

KINSEY, JENNIE

DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BUSBEE, RODNEY GENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION K

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

INFORMATION

10/5/2021: INFORMATION

AFFIDAVIT/SEARCH WARRANT

9/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT/SEARCH WARRANT

AFFIDAVIT/SEARCH WARRANT

9/24/2021: AFFIDAVIT/SEARCH WARRANT

PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

9/17/2021: PROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

9/17/2021: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

ARREST REPORT

9/17/2021: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDate time: 1/12/2022 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: BOLES, W JOEL; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • HearingDate time: 10/8/2021 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 01/12/2022 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BOLES, W JOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF SURRENDER FORM - NO TRANSPORTATION COSTS DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/08/2021 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION K ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN CR 404/ , JDG: DICKSON, BARRY EARL JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketBOLES, W JOEL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CF 004048 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (810.02(4A)) BURGL UNOCCUPIED STRUCTURE UNARMED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (812.014(2C3)) GRAND THEFT $10,000 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $20,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 3 - (806.13(1B1)) CRIM MISCH-200 DOLLARS AND UNDER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant