This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 16:06:43 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BRYANT, JOSEPH CURTIS

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BRYANT, JOSEPH CURTIS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRODERSEN, AMY P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************21 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRODERSEN, AMY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BRYANT, JOSEPH CURTIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 01/07/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 01/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: LOITERING-OR PROWLING (856.021); Level: M; Degree: S; Disposition: GUILTY [G]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004121 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (856.021) LOITERING-OR PROWLING

    Read MoreRead Less