This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/19/2020 at 19:03:26 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BREAUX, DEVON DARRICK

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BREAUX, DEVON DARRICK. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NOBLES, LINDA L., YOUNG, CHARLES P, SMITH, KERRA A and KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************27 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NOBLES, LINDA L.

YOUNG, CHARLES P

SMITH, KERRA A

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BREAUX, DEVON DARRICK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: OUT OF STATE FUGITIVE (941.13); Level: 9; Degree: N; Disposition: EXTRADITION [Z]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NO PLEA ENTERED SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketJAIL RELEASE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/20/2020 1:30 PM; Event: VIDEO APPEARANCE; Judge: SMITH, KERRA A; Location: VIDEO COURTROOM; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 03/20/2020 AT 9:30 AM IN CR VID/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/20/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/20/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000827 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (941.13) OUT OF STATE FUGITIVE

    Read MoreRead Less