This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/05/2020 at 17:07:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BOVERT, CHRISTOPHER BROCK JR

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BOVERT, CHRISTOPHER BROCK JR. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************99 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

BOVERT, CHRISTOPHER BROCK

BOVERT, CHRISTOPHER BROCK JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 08/26/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: PAYMENT DEADLINE REQUIRED BY: 08/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • HearingDate time: 1/28/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS (893.13(6b)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: ADJ W/H BY JDG [W]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketSENTENCING JUDGE: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • DocketDEFENDANT ENTERED PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE/NO CONTEST SEQ 1

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6B)) MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF5-70339590 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF5-70339589 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION FOUR ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 01/28/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: FRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketFRYDRYCHOWICZ, JENNIFER J: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/08/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000099 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (893.13(6B)) MARIJUANA POSSESS-NOT MORE THAN 20 GRAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (893.147(1)) DRUG EQUIP POSSESS-AND OR USE

    Read MoreRead Less