This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/23/2020 at 17:11:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BLEDSOE, WENDELL WAYNE

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BLEDSOE, WENDELL WAYNE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are NOBLES, LINDA L., BRODERSEN, AMY P and KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************69 A

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

NOBLES, LINDA L.

BRODERSEN, AMY P

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BLEDSOE, WENDELL WAYNE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A

Defendant Attorney

DEES, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

2/24/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • HearingDate time: 6/30/2020 9:00 AM; Event: DOCKET DAY; Judge: NOBLES, LINDA L.; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/19/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: KINSEY, JENNIE; Location: COURTROOM 401; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketDOCKET DAY SET FOR 06/30/2020 AT 9:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: NOBLES, LINDA L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (825.102(1)) CRIMES AGAINST PERSON-ABUSE ELDERLY OR DISABLED ADULT WO GREAT HARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • DocketWRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE FOR ALL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • DocketROBERT@ROBERTDEESPA.COM, OFFICE@ROBERTDEESPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketBOND ADDRESSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROBABLE CAUSE WARRANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/19/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: KINSEY, JENNIE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 02/24/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION A ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/24/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000869 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (825.102(1)) CRIMES AGAINST PERSON-ABUSE ELDERLY OR DISABLED ADULT WO GREAT HARM

    Read MoreRead Less