This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/12/2021 at 07:34:03 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BIGNESS, MERSAYDEZ JAYDE

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BIGNESS, MERSAYDEZ JAYDE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BOLES, W JOEL and CLARK, LACEY POWELL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************52 B

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BOLES, W JOEL

CLARK, LACEY POWELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BIGNESS, MERSAYDEZ JAYDE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

PROBATION ORDER

7/1/2019: PROBATION ORDER

JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8104.1846 / 2019047947)

6/3/2019: JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8104.1846 / 2019047947)

NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

5/9/2019: NOTIFICATION TO BOND AGENT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

5/8/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS FILED BY ASA

2/7/2019: DISCOVERY OBLIGATIONS FILED BY ASA

DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

2/1/2019: DISCOVERY EXHIBIT

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

1/28/2019: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

1/25/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS FILED WITH CLERK DETERMINING THAT APPLICANT IS INDIGENT

HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

1/25/2019: HEARING WORKSHEET FILED

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

1/24/2019: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

1/23/2019: INFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

PROFESSIONAL BOND 562310438-9 POSTED $3,000.00

1/7/2019: PROFESSIONAL BOND 562310438-9 POSTED $3,000.00

ARREST REPORT: CO DEFENDANT

1/7/2019: ARREST REPORT: CO DEFENDANT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROBATION ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE - Recorded (OR.8104.1846 / 2019047947)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCOMPLIANCE CREATED: COLLECTIONS DEPARTMENT COMPLIANCE REQUIRED BY: 05/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCAPIAS RETURNED UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • HearingDate time: 5/17/2019 8:30 AM; Event: MINI DOCKET DAY; Judge: CLARK, LACEY POWELL; Location: COURTROOM 307; Result: SENTENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000 (812.014(2c1)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: ADJ W/H BY JDG [W]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2C1)) GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINFORMATION AND DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 01/25/2019 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BOLES, W JOEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketCLARK, LACEY POWELL: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND 562310438-9 POSTED $3,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT: CO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/07/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CF 000152 B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (812.014(2C1)) GRAND THEFT $300 OR MORE BUT LESS THAN $5000

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STATE OF FLORIDA is a litigant