This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 17:02:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BEAL, JESSE LEON

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BEAL, JESSE LEON. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN, SMITH, KERRA A, BURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD and DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************23 A

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

SMITH, KERRA A

BURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BEAL, JESSE LEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION F

Defendant Attorney

PD, PUBLIC DEFENDER

 

Court Documents

NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

1/15/2020: NONADVERSARIAL PROBABLE CAUSE DETERMINATION RULE 3.133

INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

1/15/2020: INITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 2; Description: KIDNAP FALSE IMPRISONMENT-ADULT (787.02(1a)); Level: F; Degree: T; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • ChargeCHARGE: Count: 1; Description: BATTERY-CAUSE BODILY HARM (784.03(1a2)); Level: M; Degree: F; Disposition: NOFILE/NO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketBOND CANCELLATION SENT TO SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOFILE/NO PROSECUTION SEQ: 2 - (787.02(1A)) KIDNAP FALSE IMPRISONMENT-ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNOFILE/NO PROSECUTION SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A2)) BATTERY-CAUSE BODILY HARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketNO PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • DocketPTR AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPUBLIC DEFENDER APPOINTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINITIAL VIDEO/WEEKEND/HOLIDAY APP HELD FOR ORIG CHGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/06/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: SHACKELFORD, JAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketVIDEO APPEARANCE SET FOR 01/15/2020 AT 1:30 PM IN CR VID/ , JDG: SMITH, KERRA A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION F ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketBURNS, JEFFREY LEONARD: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 01/15/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CF 000223 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (784.03(1A2)) BATTERY-CAUSE BODILY HARM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (787.02(1A)) KIDNAP FALSE IMPRISONMENT-ADULT

    Read MoreRead Less