This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 17:05:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. BALDRIDGE, ALLISON CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 02/12/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BALDRIDGE, ALLISON CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BRODERSEN, AMY P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53 B

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BRODERSEN, AMY P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

BALDRIDGE, ALLISON CHRISTINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE

Defendant Attorney

ETHERIDGE, RANDALL J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2020
  • HearingDate time: 3/31/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • HearingDate time: 2/25/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: BRODERSEN, AMY P; Location: COURTROOM 301; Result: CONTINUED/RESET/PASSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketFILED SEQ: 1 - (812.014(3A)) PETIT THEFT 2ND DEGREE FIRST OFFENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketHEARING WORKSHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 03/31/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT, AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/25/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P - PER JA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/18/2020; Receipt Number: 2020013714; Applied Amount: $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPRO SE MOTION TO GET A CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.30 RECEIPT #2020013714

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 02/26/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: BRODERSEN, AMY P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketBRODERSEN, AMY P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION THREE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR (CO DEF)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO APPEAR SEQ: 1 - (812.015(2)) SHOPLIFTING-PETIT FROM MERCHANT FIRST CONVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/12/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 000653 B

    Read MoreRead Less