This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/09/2020 at 16:13:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA vs. ANGELO, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ANGELO, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, CHARLES P. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34 A

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, CHARLES P

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ANGELO, CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE

Defendant Attorney

DEES, ROBERT

 

Court Documents

ARREST REPORT

9/25/2020: ARREST REPORT

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2020
  • HearingDate time: 10/15/2020 8:30 AM; Event: ARRAIGNMENTS; Judge: YOUNG, CHARLES P; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • DocketROBERT@ROBERTDEESPA.COM, OFFICE@ROBERTDEESPA.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketWRITTEN WAIVER OF DEFENDANT'S APPEARANCE FOR ALL PRETRIAL CONFERENCES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketDEMAND FOR DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE, WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY, WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF570354699 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROFESSIONAL BOND CF570354698 POSTED $1,000.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketARREST REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketARRAIGNMENTS SET FOR 10/15/2020 AT 8:30 AM IN MC/ , JDG: YOUNG, CHARLES P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketYOUNG, CHARLES P: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPROSECUTOR: STATE ATTORNEY, DIVISION ONE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/25/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 MM 004134 A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 1 - (316.193(1)) DUI ALCOHOL OR DRUGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketARREST SEQ: 2 - (316.1939(1)) REFUSE TO SUBMIT TO DUI TEST

    Read MoreRead Less