This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/27/2021 at 19:37:01 (UTC).

ZAGALA, TAMMY JEAN vs. INNISFREE HOTELS INC A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/29/2021 ZAGALA, TAMMY JEAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against INNISFREE HOTELS INC A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is NOBLES, LINDA L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********2307

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

NOBLES, LINDA L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ZAGALA, TAMMY JEAN

Defendants

INNISFREE HOTELS INC A FOREIGN PROFIT CORPORATION

HAMPTON INNS MANAGEMENT LLC A FOREIGN LIMITED LIABILITY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERTH, JASON C

Defendant Attorney

OPPENHEIMER, PETER J

 

Court Documents

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

7/29/2021: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/29/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

7/29/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HAMPTON INNS MANAGEMENT LLC

7/27/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HAMPTON INNS MANAGEMENT LLC

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, INNISFREE HOTELS INC

7/27/2021: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, INNISFREE HOTELS INC

CIVIL COVER SHEET

7/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

7/27/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketINITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER-GENERAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: OPPENHEIMER, PETER J ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 7/29/2021; Receipt Number: 2021059064; Applied Amount: $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketJGSERVICE@FORTHEPEOPLE.COM, JGERTH@FORTHEPEOPLE.COM, POPPENHEIMER@MARLOWADLER.COM, VCORREA@MARLOWADLER.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: GERTH, JASON C ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketNOBLES, LINDA L.: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 07/29/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002307

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, HAMPTON INNS MANAGEMENT LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, INNISFREE HOTELS INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INNISFREE HOTELS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPPENHEIMER , PETER JOHN