This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/14/2022 at 18:25:25 (UTC).

WESTBROOK, KAY vs. SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 WESTBROOK, KAY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1758

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTBROOK, KAY

Defendant

SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTSTEIN, JONATHAN I

Defendant Attorney

WIGGINS, CHARLES THOMAS

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

9/15/2022: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL- PENSACOLA INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDEFENDANTS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF FINAL SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/20/2022; Receipt Number: 2022071050; Applied Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022071050

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketL.BONNER@ROTSTEIN-SHIFFMAN.COM, M.OTTO@ROTSTEIN-SHIFFMAN.COM, T.DALLAROSA@ROTSTEIN-SHIFFMAN.COM, CTW@BEGGSLANE.COM, AMN@BEGGSLANE.COM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: ROTSTEIN, JONATHAN I ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/15/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001758

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SELECT SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PENSACOLA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIGGINS, CHARLES THOMAS