This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/18/2021 at 18:49:14 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs. THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST RANDALL I WEAVER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 05/23/2017 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST RANDALL I WEAVER DECEASED. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCIVER, KEITH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0772

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCIVER, KEITH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendants

WEAVER, ROGER K

UNKNOWN PARTY #3 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

WEAVER, ROY G

UNKNOWN PARTY #4 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

UNKNOWN PARTY # 1

TETRICK, SANDRA LYNN

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES OR OTHER CLAIMANTS CLAIMING BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST RANDALL I WEAVER DECEASED

UNKNOWN PARTY # 2 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

12/5/2017: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE , PLAINTIFF, $ 50,000.00

11/9/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SALE , PLAINTIFF, $ 50,000.00

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

11/2/2017: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, PLAINTIFF $102,367.40 - Recorded (OR.7794.128 / 2017080778)

10/17/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, PLAINTIFF $102,367.40 - Recorded (OR.7794.128 / 2017080778)

PROOF OF PUBLICATION

7/20/2017: PROOF OF PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF ACTION, SUNPRESS

6/28/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION, SUNPRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED FROM MARINSOSCI LAW GROUP INC WITH ATTACHMENTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 4/11/2018; Receipt Number: 2018034871; Applied Amount: $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $50.00 RECEIPT #2018034871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketLISPENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/23/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000772

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant