Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 03/21/2021 at 20:03:28 (UTC).

WEINBURG, EDWARD JR vs. TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 WEINBURG, EDWARD JR filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SHACKELFORD, JAN and DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1772

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SHACKELFORD, JAN

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WEINBURG, EDWARD JR

Defendant

TOWER HILL PRIME INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM, DAVID M

Defendant Attorney

PALMER, ELIZABETH NICOLE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT AMD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

12/18/2020: COMPLAINT AMD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ABATE PENDING APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDANNHEISSER., THOMAS: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketBLANNKET ORDER OF RECUSAL -REASSIGNED TO DIVISION F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketSTIPULATION TO SUBMIT TO APPRAISAL PROCESS AND STAY LITIGATION PENDING APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketDEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO ABATE OR STAY ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 12/21/2020; Receipt Number: 2020084243; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2020084243

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDGRAHAM@DGINSLAW.COM, KHIGHLEY@DGINSLAW.COM, PLLEADINGS@DAVIDGRAHAMINSURANCELAW.COM, NPALMER@WPSLAWYERS.COM, JBOLING@WPSLAWYERS.COM, CSCHREINER@WPSLAWYERS.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCOULD NOT PARSE DOCKET CODE TEXT FOR DOCKETCODE = PLATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 12/21/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CA 001772

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AMD DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tower Hill Prime Ins Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALMER, ELIZABETH NICOLE