This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/19/2021 at 05:53:46 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. DENNIS, NANCY E

Case Summary

On 06/08/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DENNIS, NANCY E. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCIVER, KEITH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0859

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCIVER, KEITH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT

FLORIDA HOUSING FINANCE CORPORATION

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

DENNIS, NANCY E

CHASEFIELD HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF NANCY E. DENNIS

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

10/1/2018: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, PLAINTIFF, $183,485.94 - Recorded (OR.7910.747 / 2018042880)

6/1/2018: CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, PLAINTIFF, $183,485.94 - Recorded (OR.7910.747 / 2018042880)

CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, PLAINTIFF, $183,485.94

5/22/2018: CONSENT FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE, PLAINTIFF, $183,485.94

STANDARD AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

11/9/2017: STANDARD AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

LISPENDENS

6/8/2017: LISPENDENS

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2018
  • DocketLETTER DISBURSING FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/21/2018; Receipt Number: 2018087756; Applied Amount: $140.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $140.00 RECEIPT #2018087756

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/19/2018; Receipt Number: 2018086630; Applied Amount: $862.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/19/2018; Receipt Number: 2018086628; Applied Amount: $118,895.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SALE, BAY TO GULF HOLDINGS LLC, $123,200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $862.40 RECEIPT #2018086630

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $118,895.50 RECEIPT #2018086628

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketVALUE CALCULATION FOR REAL PROPERTY/MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLISPENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S ATTORNEY: FULLER, SHANE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketMCIVER, KEITH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/08/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000859

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Florida Housing Finance Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Secretary of Housing and Urban Development is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant