This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 11/29/2022 at 18:10:37 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY vs. CITRUS CONTRACTING LLC

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against CITRUS CONTRACTING LLC. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ III ] LIGHTEL, KRISTINA DENISE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********5353

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ III ] LIGHTEL, KRISTINA DENISE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

CITRUS CONTRACTING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORTESE, DAWN M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketTRANSFER CASE SENT BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO PASCO COUNTY CLERK OF COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FROM ATTORNEY TO CLERK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO TRANSFER TO PASCO COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketFIRST COLLECTIONS NOTICE SENT EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketAMENDED ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS EXPARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER TO PASCO COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS EXPARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER TO SARASOTA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/30/2022; Receipt Number: 2022074164; Applied Amount: $300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $300.00 RECEIPT #2022074164

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCOVERSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: CORTESE, DAWN M ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketLIGHTEL, KRISTINA DENISE: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/30/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CC 005353

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITRUS CONTRACTING, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cortese, Dawn Marie, ESQ