This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/18/2021 at 16:24:06 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs. PATE, SOPHIA MARIE

Case Summary

On 05/18/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against PATE, SOPHIA MARIE. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MCIVER, KEITH A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0738

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MCIVER, KEITH A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN PARTY #1 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

UNKNOWN PARTY #4 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

UNKNOWN PARTY #2 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

UNKNOWN PARTY #3 (DISMISSED BEFORE A HEARING **CIVIL** -

ESCAMBIA COUNTY HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY

AUTUMN MEADOWS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

PATE, SOPHIA MARIE

 

Court Documents

LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS

8/3/2018: LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS

CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS

1/3/2018: CLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS

LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS

12/21/2017: LETTER DISBURSING FUNDS

CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

12/19/2017: CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

12/19/2017: CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT

CERTIFICATE OF SALE , BAY TO GULF HOLDINGS LLC, $155,300.00

12/8/2017: CERTIFICATE OF SALE , BAY TO GULF HOLDINGS LLC, $155,300.00

FORECLOSURE CHECKLIST FOR FINAL HEARING

10/4/2017: FORECLOSURE CHECKLIST FOR FINAL HEARING

NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FES AND AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

10/4/2017: NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FES AND AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

PAYMENT $967.50 RECEIPT #2017052399

5/18/2017: PAYMENT $967.50 RECEIPT #2017052399

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 8/3/2018; Receipt Number: 2018072429; Applied Amount: $15.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER DISBURSING FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $15.00 RECEIPT #2018072429

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • DocketORDER FOR RELEASE OF SURPLUS FUNDS RETAINED IN COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DocketMOTION FOR RELEASE OF SURPLUS FUNDS RETAINED IN COURT REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNIFORM VERIFIED MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION IN FORECLOSURE CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 1/3/2018; Receipt Number: 2018000928; Applied Amount: $149,872.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLAIM FOR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SURPLUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketPAYMENT $149,872.00 RECEIPT #2018000928

    Read MoreRead Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: GRAMSKY, BRITTANY SUE ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketMCIVER, KEITH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • DocketCASE FILED 05/18/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CA 000738

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE ESCAMBIA COUNTY HOUSING FINANCE AUTHORITY is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank, N.A. as Trustee for the RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT is a litigant