This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/18/2022 at 22:26:57 (UTC).

TWILLEY MELLON, TAMARA MICHELLE vs. MELLON, BRET MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 08/23/2021 TWILLEY MELLON, TAMARA MICHELLE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MELLON, BRET MICHAEL. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MILLER, JOHN L and MCIVER (YL), KEITH A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3175

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MILLER, JOHN L

MCIVER (YL), KEITH A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TWILLEY MELLON, TAMARA MICHELLE

Respondent

MELLON, BRET MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

YORK, LISA K

Respondent Attorney

BURNS, JAMES M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING COPY OF DRIVER'S LICENSE- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketANSWER TO WIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: BURNS, JAMES M ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 9/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMILLER, JOHN L: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S OBJECTION TO ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 8/25/2021; Receipt Number: 2021066292; Applied Amount: $418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $418.00 RECEIPT #2021066292

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketLISAYORK@LISAYORKLAW.COM, INFO@LISAYORKLAW.COM, YORKLISA@COX.NET, JIMBURNSFLLAW@GMAIL.COM, PLEADINGS.JMBPA@GMAIL.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION AS TO SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMCIVER (YL), KEITH A: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER'S ATTORNEY: YORK, LISA K ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER/WIFE'S NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BURNS, JAMES M