This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 08/05/2022 at 18:21:29 (UTC).

TSINONIS, PETER vs. CIRCLE K STORES, INC., A FOREIGN PROFIT CORP

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 TSINONIS, PETER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against CIRCLE K STORES, INC , A FOREIGN PROFIT CORP. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN .... The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1052

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ E-CIVIL ] SHACKELFORD, JAN ...

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TSINONIS, PETER

Defendant

CIRCLE K STORES, INC., A FOREIGN PROFIT CORP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

UNICE, T R JR

Defendant Attorney

SCARPONE, KAYLA M

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/3/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY

6/3/2022: PETITION FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY

PROPOSED SUMMONS

6/3/2022: PROPOSED SUMMONS

ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

6/12/2022: ORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSELAND EMAIL DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REGARDING REQUIRED REPORTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2022
  • DocketSERVICE@UNICESALZMAN.COM, JJENSEN@UNICESALZMAN.COM, VGERLICH@UNICESALZMAN.COM, KEFFINGER@UNICESALZMAN.COM, KSCARPONE@CARRALLISON.COM, JVANHISE@CARRALLISON.COM, MHAYES@CARRALLISON.COM, BECHOLS@CARRALLISON.COM, LKUSTEL@CARRALLISON.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 6/8/2022; Receipt Number: 2022043541; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022043541

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketCOULD NOT PARSE DOCKET CODE TEXT FOR DOCKETCODE = PLATT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketSHACKELFORD, JAN ...: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 06/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001052

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR PURE BILL OF DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCARPONE, KAYLA MICHELLE