This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 10/15/2021 at 15:12:20 (UTC).

TRAYNOR, STEPHANIE vs. NOLAN, THOMAS

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 TRAYNOR, STEPHANIE filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NOLAN, THOMAS. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********3469

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

PITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRAYNOR, STEPHANIE

Respondent

NOLAN, THOMAS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/5/2021; Receipt Number: 2021076849; Applied Amount: $5.90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPARTIAL AGREEMENT FOR AMELIA NOLAN - SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES / PARENTING PLAN - SIGNED BY RESPONDENT ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $5.90 RECEIPT #2021076849

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/30/2021; Receipt Number: 2021075324; Applied Amount: $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR HEARING / NON JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE FROM TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR- PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $0.30 RECEIPT #2021075324

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/28/2021; Receipt Number: 2021074735; Applied Amount: $9.10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCERTIFICATE FROM TRANSPARENTING SEMINAR- RESPONDENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketUNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ENFORCEMENT ACT AFFIDAVIT - PETITIONER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketWIFE'S PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $421.75 RECEIPT #2021071968

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketORDER TO ATTEND DCF APPROVED PARENT EDUCATION AND STABILIZATION COURSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketFAMILY LAW STANDING PRETRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketPITRE, STEPHEN ANTHONY: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 003469

    Read MoreRead Less