Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 04/21/2021 at 15:03:43 (UTC).

TOFE, ANDREW vs. FRONTLINE INSURANCE UNLIMITED COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/24/2021 TOFE, ANDREW filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FRONTLINE INSURANCE UNLIMITED COMPANY. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is DANNHEISSER., THOMAS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0679

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

DANNHEISSER., THOMAS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TOFE, ANDREW

Defendant

FRONTLINE INSURANCE UNLIMITED COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIBERMAN, MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

GUTTERMAN, MARC J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/24/2021; Receipt Number: 2021021520; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021021520

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketSERVICE@ILGPA.COM, LEVI@ILGPA.COM, ESERVICE@GUTTERMANGROUP.COM, MGUTTERMAN@GUTTERMANGROUP.COM, ESERVICE@GUTTERMANGROUP.COM, DABOSCH@GUTTERMANGROUP.COM, ESERVICE@GUTTERMANGROUP.COM, HFINNERAN@GUTTERMANGROUP.COM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY: BIBERMAN, MICHAEL ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDANNHEISSER., THOMAS: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/24/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 000679

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketPROPOSED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Frontline Insurance Unlimited Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gutterman, Marc Jason