This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/24/2021 at 19:07:47 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: WRIGHT, RAYMOND ONEAL

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 THE ESTATE OF WRIGHT, RAYMOND ONEAL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOLES, W JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1408

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOLES, W JOEL

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WRIGHT, THOMAS DANIEL

RICHARDSON, CATHY JEANETTE

Claimants

HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA

ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS

Decedent

WRIGHT, RAYMOND ONEAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STAPLES, THOMAS C

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF FN OF PA AND PDH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA FOR $2,543.90

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS FOR $522.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE OF PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/26/2020; Receipt Number: 2020071733; Applied Amount: $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2020071733

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketEMAIL DESIGNATION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF THOMAS DANIEL WRIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: STAPLES, THOMAS C ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketBOLES, W JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketCLERK DETERMINED INFORMATION IS SUBJECT TO CONFIDENTIALITY UNDER IDENTIFIED PROVISION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOSPITAL PHYSICIAN SERVICES OF FLORIDA PA is a litigant

Latest cases where ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS (SATISFIED - is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STAPLES, THOMAS C