This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/16/2023 at 19:04:04 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: WILLIAMS, NELLIE RUTH

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 THE ESTATE OF WILLIAMS, NELLIE RUTH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1859

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

WILLIAMS, TIMOTHY LEE

Decedent

WILLIAMS, NELLIE RUTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MOSLEY, JASON ROYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8897.593 / 2022115214)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND ORDER ADMITTING WILL - Recorded (OR.8896.388 / 2022114556)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION AND ORDER ADMITTING WILL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/18/2022; Receipt Number: 2022086081; Applied Amount: $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRUST D/O/D- 09/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2022086081

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/18/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001859

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT TO PSA - DARRELLL WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketWAIVER AND CONSENT TO PSA - CRAIG WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less