This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/07/2023 at 19:13:47 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: WILLIAMS, DENNIS L

Case Summary

On 11/09/2022 THE ESTATE OF WILLIAMS, DENNIS L was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1821

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner

WILLIAMS, JENNY I

Claimants

ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS

ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL

STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION (SATISFIED -

Decedent

WILLIAMS, DENNIS L

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SCHULTZ, KERRY ANNE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketSATISFACTION AND RELEASE OF CLAIM - ASCENSION HEART HOSPITAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF CLAIM - STATE OF FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM BY STATE OF FLORIDA, AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION FOR $1,024.12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ASCENSION SACRED HEART HOSPITAL FOR $33,235.01

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS FOR $1,260.00 EMAILED ATTY KERRY ANN SCHULTZ ON 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8891.161 / 2022111782)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022084113

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketWAIVER JINDER AND CONSENT TO PDH - SEAN WILLIAMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/09/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less