This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 06/13/2023 at 20:06:54 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: SCHLOSSER, JAMES H

Case Summary

On 03/15/2023 THE ESTATE OF SCHLOSSER, JAMES H was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0391

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Applicant

CUNNINGHAM, MARY A

Decedent

SCHLOSSER, JAMES H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MCDONALD, BRUCE ARTHUR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8948.1396 / 2023022268)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/15/2023; Receipt Number: 2023019261; Applied Amount: $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2023019261

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketFLORIDA NON TAX CERTIFICATE/AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2023
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less