This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 13:45:42 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: SCALESE, FRANCES

Case Summary

On 03/25/2015 THE ESTATE OF SCALESE, FRANCES was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JONES, MICHAEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0396

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JONES, MICHAEL

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Applicant

SCALESE, DAVID

Decedent

SCALESE, FRANCES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2015
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 9/1/2015; Receipt Number: 2015085352; Applied Amount: $8.33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketPAYMENT $8.33 RECEIPT #2015085352

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • DocketPOSTAL CHARGES ASSESSED $8.33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • DocketRECEIPT OF TRANSFER CASE TO SANTA ROSA COUNTY WITH PROOF OF SERVICE ATTACHED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING TO SANTA ROSA COUNTY - Recorded (OR.7394.1673 / 2015063977)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/21/2015
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE-ATTY COVER LETTER RE TRANSFER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2015
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO TRANSFER PROCEEDING TO SANTA ROSA COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2015
  • HearingDate time: 8/19/2015 10:00 AM; Event: HEARING; Judge: JONES, MICHAEL; Location: M.C. BLANCHARD JUDICIAL BUILDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2015
  • DocketHEARING SET FOR 08/19/2015 AT 10:00 AM IN MC/ , JDG: JONES, MICHAEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM STATE OF NEW JERSEY MONMOUTH COUNTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2015
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 3/25/2015; Receipt Number: 2015029325; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2015029325

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketFORMAL ADMINISTRATION ASSESSED $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: TIDWELL, MICHAEL D ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketJUDGE JONES, MICHAEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2015
  • DocketCASE FILED 03/25/2015 CASE NUMBER 2015 CP 000396

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less