This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/26/2023 at 19:07:40 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: ROBERTS, CARL EDWARD

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 THE ESTATE OF ROBERTS, CARL EDWARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1889

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ U ] BOLES, W. JOEL

 

Party Details

Claimants

BAPTIST HOSPITAL

BAPTIST MEDICAL GROUP

PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES C/O CITIBANK

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

SWEETMAN, CHELSY

Decedent

ROBERTS, CARL EDWARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

MOSLEY, JASON ROYCE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - PHILLIPS & COHEN ASSOCIATES C/O CITIBANK FOR $1,100.10 EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON NTC ON AGENCY FOR HLTHCARE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8915.1360 / 2023002654)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - BAPTIST MEDICAL GROUP FOR $372.29

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - BAPTIST HOSPITAL FOR $2,228.49

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 11/28/2022; Receipt Number: 2022087578; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2022087578

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001889

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPT OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE, WAIVER OF NOTICE AND BOND, AND JOINDER IN PETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY - TAYLOR ROBERTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less