This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/23/2023 at 19:16:20 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: NORWOOD, JOYCE C

Case Summary

On 10/25/2022 THE ESTATE OF NORWOOD, JOYCE C was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1747

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Claimant

HCA FLORIDA WEST HOSPITAL

Applicant

NORWOOD, DANIEL G

Decedent

NORWOOD, JOYCE C

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MATTHEWS, EDSEL F JR

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - HCA FLORIDA WEST HOSPITAL FOR $7,780.00 EMAILED ATTY EDSEL F MATTHEWS JR ON 11/28/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • DocketOATH OF WITNESS TO CODICIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketCHECKLSIT FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 10/25/2022; Receipt Number: 2022080107; Applied Amount: $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCODICIL - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT- ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2022080107

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - KELI MYERS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - JAMIE STROEHL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - ELIZABETH HAYMANS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - KIMBERLY CREIGHTON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - R. DWAINE NORWOOD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketWAIVER OF NOTICE AND CONSENT TO PETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION - JUDY C FRYER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketCODICIL - COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT-COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE - COPY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: MATTHEWS, EDSEL F JR ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less