This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 02/02/2023 at 19:12:35 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: MCMAHON, SANDRA SUE

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 THE ESTATE OF MCMAHON, SANDRA SUE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1800

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

BARNES, TAMARA W

Claimants

HCA FLORIDA WEST HOSPITAL

ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS

FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

KEYBANK NA

Decedent

MCMAHON, SANDRA SUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

BUGAY, SCOTT R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - KEYBANK NA FOR $425.44

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION FOR $15,577.87

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - AHCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - ESCAMBIA COUNTY EMS FOR $106.87 EMAILED ATTY SCOTT R BUGAY ON 12/20/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCLAIM ENTERED - HCA FLORIDA WEST HOSPITAL FOR $1,484.00 EMAILED ATTY SCOTT R BUGAY ON 11/28/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8891.158 / 2022111779)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCONSENT TO APPT OF PR - KIRK MCMAHON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketFLORIDA NON TAX CERTIFICATE/AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMIN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketCASE FILED 11/04/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CP 001800

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less