This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/21/2023 at 19:12:10 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: MCINNIS, TREMELLAH

Case Summary

On 02/20/2023 THE ESTATE OF MCINNIS, TREMELLAH was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is [ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0253

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

[ T ] BOLES, W.. JOEL

 

Party Details

Applicant

MAVROMIHALIS, LEAH W

Decedent

MCINNIS, TREMELLAH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

HOSKIN, CHARLES P

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • DocketORDER OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketEXEMPLIFIED COPIES FROM JACKSON COUNTY, MISSISSIPPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2023
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Date: 2/20/2023; Receipt Number: 2023012143; Applied Amount: $345.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketPAYMENT $345.00 RECEIPT #2023012143

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketFLORIDA NON TAX CERTIFICATE/AFFIDAVIT OF NO FL ESTATE TAX

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANCILLARY SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketBOLES, W.. JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/20/2023 CASE NUMBER PENDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less