This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 05/15/2020 at 19:00:45 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: LUCHER, JOAN F

Case Summary

On 02/15/2020 THE ESTATE OF LUCHER, JOAN F was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KINSEY, JENNIE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0207

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Escambia County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Escambia County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KINSEY, JENNIE

 

Party Details

Decedent

LUCHER, JOAN F

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

MADDOX, MARY ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

COHEN, JOEL M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY - Recorded (OR.8286.541 / 2020034032)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S MEMO: RECEIVED PHONE CALL FROM ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY NEVER RECEIVED THE CERTIFIED COPIES PAID FOR. SENT CC ON 4/3/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8268.33 / 2020025022)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $8.00 RECEIPT #2020013422

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2020013419

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: COHEN, JOEL M ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • DocketKINSEY, JENNIE: ASSIGNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE AND DESIGNATION AND ACCEPTANCE OF RESIDENT AGENT - MARY ELIZABETH MADDOX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION - COPY OF LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2020
  • DocketCASE FILED 02/15/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CP 000207

    Read MoreRead Less