This case was last updated from Escambia County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 03:56:53 (UTC).

THE ESTATE OF: LORILLARD, FRANCES JOANNE

Case Summary

On 09/23/2020 THE ESTATE OF LORILLARD, FRANCES JOANNE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Escambia County Courts, Escambia County Courthouse located in Escambia, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is BOLES, W JOEL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********1244

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Escambia, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

BOLES, W JOEL

 

Party Details

Decedent

LORILLARD, FRANCES JOANNE

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

ROBISON, LINDA E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

WHIBBS, SUZANNE N

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS TO FLORIDA AGENCY FOR HEALTH CARE ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketINVENTORY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION - Recorded (OR.8382.504 / 2020084218)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL - Recorded (OR.8382.389 / 2020084194)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL AND APPOINTING PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketORDER PRESCRIBING TIME REQUIREMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT - ORIGINAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCHECKLIST FOR OPENING FORMAL ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - KATHLEEN ANN FULK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketJOINDER, WAIVER AND CONSENT - GARY DEAN GRAY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketAGREEMENT AMONG BENEFICIARIES REGARDING DISTRIBUTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS (SEND TO SUNPRESS ONCE LETTERS ARE SIGNED) (SENT TO SUNPRESS 10/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketOATH OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE & DESIGNATION OF AGT & ACPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketRESPONDENT'S ATTORNEY: WHIBBS, SUZANNE N ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketBOLES, W JOEL: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WHIBBS, SUZANNE N